Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Orazio Marzani

Deceased

Bishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Dec 1586AppointedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
28 Dec 1586Ordained BishopBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
3 Jun 1607DiedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy

MicroData Summary for Orazio Marzani
Bishop Orazio Marzani (died ) Bishop of San Severino (Marche)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 298
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 25, Number 116
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1586, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018