Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of San Severino

Dioecesis Sancti Severini in Piceno

United

To: Archdiocese of Camerino-San Severino Marche



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of San Severino (Marche)
26 November 1586ErectedDiocese of San Severino (Marche) (erected)
Diocese of San Severino (-Treia)
20 February 1920UnitedDiocese of San Severino (Marche)
Diocese of Treia
Diocese of San Severino (-Treia)
25 January 1985SplitDiocese of Macerata e Tolentino
Diocese of Osimo e Cingoli
Diocese of Recanati
Diocese of San Severino (-Treia)
Diocese of Macerata-Tolentino-Recanati-Cingoli-Treia
Diocese of San Severino
25 January 1985SplitDiocese of San Severino (-Treia) Diocese of San Severino
30 September 1986UnitedArchdiocese of Camerino
Diocese of San Severino
Archdiocese of Camerino-San Severino Marche

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of San Severino (-Treia)
195020,00020,000100.0%453176263299329ap1951
196914,65024,06860.9%5932911603915536ap1971
198022,74822,80799.7%4622683342611439ap1981
Diocese of San Severino

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 23 Jun 2013