Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edoardo Menichelli

Archbishop of Ancona-Osimo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1939 BornSan Severino Marche
3 Jul 196525.7Ordained PriestPriest of San Severino (-Treia), Italy
30 Sep 198646.9IncardinatedPriest of Camerino-San Severino Marche, Italy
10 Jun 199454.6AppointedArchbishop of Chieti-Vasto, Italy
9 Jul 199454.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Chieti-Vasto, Italy
8 Jan 200464.2AppointedArchbishop of Ancona-Osimo, Italy
7 Mar 200464.3InstalledArchbishop of Ancona-Osimo, Italy
14 Feb 201575.3Elevated to Cardinal

MicroData Summary for Edoardo Menichelli:
Archbishop Edoardo Menichelli (born ) Archbishop of Ancona-Osimo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Ancona-Osimo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,351
  • c: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015