Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Santoro

Bishop Emeritus of Avezzano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1946 Born
17 Jun 197024.3Ordained PriestPriest of Chieti, Italy
28 Jun 200761.3AppointedBishop of Avezzano, Italy
6 Sep 200761.5Ordained BishopBishop of Avezzano, Italy
15 Sep 200761.6InstalledBishop of Avezzano, Italy
23 Jul 202175.4RetiredBishop of Avezzano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Santoro
Bishop Pietro Santoro (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Avezzano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVasto, Archdiocese of Chieti
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Maggiore, Church, Vasto, Archdiocese of Chieti-Vasto

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Avezzano.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,502
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 21 Sep 2021

Quantcast