Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Josef Schneider

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bamberg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1906BornNürnberg
25 Oct 193125.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bamberg, Germany
16 May 195549.3AppointedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
13 Jul 195549.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
30 Jul 197670.5ResignedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
18 Jan 199892.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Josef Schneider:
Archbishop Josef Schneider (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bamberg

  • a priest for 66.2 years
  • a bishop for 42.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013