Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Elmar Maria Kredel

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bamberg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1922BornNürnberg
30 Jul 195028.4Ordained PriestPriest of Bamberg, Germany
27 May 197755.2AppointedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
2 Jul 197755.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
22 May 197856.2AppointedBishop of Germany, Military
30 Nov 199068.7ResignedBishop of Germany, Military
31 Mar 199472.1ResignedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
10 Jun 200886.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Elmar Maria Kredel:
Archbishop Elmar Maria Kredel (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bamberg

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015