Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Werner Radspieler

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bamberg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Thugga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1938Born
8 Mar 196425.5Ordained PriestPriest of Bamberg, Germany
7 Nov 198648.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
7 Nov 198648.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thugga
21 Dec 198648.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thugga
9 Sep 201375.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
7 Mar 201879.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Werner Radspieler (VIAF: 245167232)
Bishop Werner Radspieler (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bamberg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNürnberg, Archdiocese of Bamberg
Death PlaceNürnberg, Archdiocese of Bamberg

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Sep 2013
  • d: CB, 7 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 9 Mar 2018