Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Karl Heinrich Braun

Archbishop Emeritus of Bamberg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1930 BornKempten
10 Oct 195827.8Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
17 Apr 198453.3AppointedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
16 Jun 198453.5Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
25 Mar 199564.3AppointedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
25 May 199564.4InstalledArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
2 Jul 200170.6ResignedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Karl Heinrich Braun:
Archbishop Karl Heinrich Braun (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bamberg

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bamberg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 13 Mar 2014