Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Otto Kolb

Deceased

Archbishop of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1881Born
30 Jul 190523.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bamberg, Germany
10 Aug 193553.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
10 Aug 193553.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Velicia
13 Oct 193554.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Velicia
26 Jan 194361.4AppointedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
9 May 194361.7InstalledArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
29 Mar 195573.6DiedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joseph Otto Kolb
Archbishop Joseph Otto Kolb (born , died ) Archbishop of Bamberg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeßlach

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast