Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Walter Cardinal Brandmüller

President Emeritus of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of San Giuliano dei Fiamminghi

Titular See: (Pontifical Committee for Historical Sciences)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1929 BornAnsbach, Germany
26 Jul 195324.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bamberg, Germany
4 Jun 199869.4AppointedPresident of the Roman Curia - Other
3 Dec 200980.9RetiredPresident of the Roman Curia - Other
4 Nov 201081.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
13 Nov 201081.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
20 Nov 201081.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giuliano dei Fiamminghi
20 Nov 201081.9Elevated to Cardinal
6 Mar 201182.2InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Giuliano dei Fiamminghi

MicroData Summary for Walter Brandmüller:
Cardinal Walter Brandmüller (born ) President Emeritus of Roman Curia - Other

Please contact the Cardinal through the Roman Curia - Other.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Nov 2010
  • b: JPG
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,862
  • ab (via CB): Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 103, Page 858

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013