Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaudenzio Binaschi

Deceased

Bishop of Pinerolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1883BornTornaco
1 May 190623.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 193047.0AppointedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
30 Mar 193047.2Ordained BishopBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
11 May 193047.3InstalledBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
23 May 196885.3DiedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaudenzio Binaschi:
Bishop Gaudenzio Binaschi (born , died ) Bishop of Pinerolo

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013