Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastiano Briacca

Deceased

Bishop of Mondovi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1888BornBorgo Ticino
29 Jun 191224.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Oct 193244.4AppointedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
20 Nov 193244.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mondovi, Italy
13 Oct 196375.4DiedBishop of Mondovi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Briacca:
Bishop Sebastiano Briacca (born , died ) Bishop of Mondovi

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,750
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013