Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gaetano Cardinal Alimonda

Deceased

Archbishop of Torino {Turin}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1818BornGenoa
11 Mar 184324.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Genova, Italy
10 Jun 184324.6Ordained PriestPriest of Genova, Italy
21 Sep 187758.9AppointedBishop of Albenga, Italy
11 Nov 187759.1Ordained BishopBishop of Albenga, Italy
12 May 187960.6Elevated to Cardinal
12 May 187960.6ResignedBishop of Albenga, Italy
22 Sep 187960.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina
9 Aug 188364.8AppointedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
30 May 189172.6DiedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Alimonda:
Cardinal Gaetano Alimonda (born , died ) Archbishop of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
  • a cardinal for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 86, and Page 538
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 51
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 May 1879

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013