Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Cagliero, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1838Born
14 Jun 186224.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
20 Nov 188345.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Patagonia {Patagonia Settentrionale}, Argentina
30 Oct 188446.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Magydus
7 Dec 188446.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Magydus
24 Mar 190466.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sebastea
10 Jun 190870.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Costa Rica
19 Dec 190870.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Honduras
19 Dec 190870.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Nicaragua
6 Dec 191577.9Elevated to Cardinal
6 Dec 191577.9ResignedApostolic Delegate to Costa Rica
6 Dec 191577.9ResignedApostolic Delegate to Honduras
6 Dec 191577.9ResignedApostolic Delegate to Nicaragua
9 Dec 191577.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
16 Dec 192082.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
16 Jan 192183.0InstalledCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
28 Feb 192688.1DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Cagliero (VIAF: 47026955)
Giovanni Cardinal Cagliero S.D.B. (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelnuovo d'Asti, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}, Italy
Ordained PriestTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}, Italy
Ordained BishopTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Propagation of the Faith sepulchre, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)Mater Misericordiæ, Cathedral, Viedma, Diocese of Viedma, Argentina

  • a priest for 63.7 years
  • a bishop for 41.2 years
  • a cardinal for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 360
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 61
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 103, and Page 145, and Page 179

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 11 Mar 2018