Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guglielmo Piani, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate to México

Titular Archbishop of Nicosia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1875BornMartinengo, Italy
15 May 189822.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
16 Dec 192146.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Pamphylia
16 Dec 192146.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
17 Mar 192246.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Dramas
17 Mar 192246.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Philippines
14 May 192246.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Dramas
21 Apr 193458.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicosia
5 Oct 194873.1AppointedOfficial to México
13 Apr 195175.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to México
27 Sep 195681.0DiedApostolic Delegate to México

MicroData Summary for Guglielmo Piani:
Archbishop Guglielmo Piani S.D.B. (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate of México

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013