Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Paulo Santos Songco

Deceased

Archbishop of Caceres (Nueva Caceres)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1889BornPorac
15 Mar 191323.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 May 193848.9AppointedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
15 Aug 193849.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
29 Jun 195162.0AppointedArchbishop of Caceres (Nueva Caceres), Philippines
6 Apr 196575.8DiedArchbishop of Caceres (Nueva Caceres), Philippines

MicroData Summary for Pedro Paulo Santos Songco:
Archbishop Pedro Paulo Santos Songco (born , died ) Archbishop of Caceres (Nueva Caceres)

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013