Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Flaviano Barrechea Ariola

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Legazpi, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1905Born
21 Mar 193125.7Ordained PriestPriest of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
15 May 195246.8AppointedBishop of Legazpi, Philippines
6 Aug 195247.0Ordained BishopBishop of Legazpi, Philippines
27 Nov 196863.3ResignedBishop of Legazpi, Philippines
27 Nov 196863.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Guzabeta
4 Dec 197065.4ResignedTitular Bishop of Guzabeta
31 May 198175.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Legazpi, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Flaviano Barrechea Ariola
Bishop Flaviano Barrechea Ariola (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Legazpi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLegazpi

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 69
  • mn/c1: CB, 27 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast