Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arnulfo Surtida Arcilla

Deceased

Bishop of Sorsogon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1922BornVirac
27 Apr 194724.6Ordained PriestPriest
7 Sep 195937.0AppointedBishop of Sorsogon, Philippines
12 Dec 195937.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sorsogon, Philippines
11 Dec 197957.3ResignedBishop of Sorsogon, Philippines
25 Oct 199270.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Sorsogon, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Arnulfo Surtida Arcilla:
Bishop Arnulfo Surtida Arcilla (born , died ) Bishop of Sorsogon

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 104
  • mn: CB, 22 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 24 Jul 2015