Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Gasparri

Deceased

Chamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

Prefect of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs

Titular See: (Pontifical Commission for the Codification of Canon Law)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1852Born
31 Mar 187724.9Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
18 Dec 189745.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Peru
18 Dec 189745.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Bolivia
18 Dec 189745.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Ecuador
12 Feb 189845.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Palaestina
6 Mar 189845.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Palaestina
23 Apr 190148.9AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
16 Dec 190755.6Elevated to Cardinal
16 Dec 190755.6ResignedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
19 Dec 190755.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
13 Oct 191462.4AppointedSecretary of State
22 Jan 191562.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
9 Dec 191563.5ResignedCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
4 Dec 191664.5AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
16 Oct 191765.4AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for the Authentic Interpretation of the Code of Canon Law
22 Jan 192269.7CeasedSecretary of State
6 Feb 192269.7ConfirmedSecretary of State
5 Jul 192573.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
7 Feb 193077.7RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Commission for the Authentic Interpretation of the Code of Canon Law
7 Feb 193077.7RetiredSecretary of State
18 Nov 193482.5DiedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber

MicroData Summary for Pietro Gasparri (VIAF: 49267224)
Pietro Cardinal Gasparri (born , died ) Chamberlain (Camerlengo) of Apostolic Chamber

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapovallazza, Diocese of Norcia, Italy
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSaint-Joseph des Carmes, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Ussita

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
  • a cardinal for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 167
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 14
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • xsta/x933/nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 14, and Page 24, and Page 70
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 112, and Page 113, and Page 204

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast