Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Borgongini Duca

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Vallicella


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1884Born
22 Dec 190622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
28 Jun 192137.3AppointedPro-Secretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
14 Oct 192238.6AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
7 Jun 192945.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
7 Jun 192945.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Italy
29 Jun 192945.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
12 Jan 195368.8Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jan 195368.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Italy
15 Jan 195368.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Vallicella
4 Oct 195470.6DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Borgongini Duca (VIAF: 88623252)
Francesco Cardinal Borgongini Duca (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Italy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
  • a cardinal for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 50
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • x933/nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 25, and Page 157

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 12 Mar 2018