Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Cremonesi

Deceased

Secret Almoner Emeritus of the Office of Papal Charities

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1866BornRoma
21 Jun 189023.6Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
29 Dec 192155.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicomedia
29 Dec 192155.1AppointedSecret Almoner of the Office of Papal Charities
8 Jan 192255.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicomedia
21 Mar 192659.3AppointedPrelate of Beatissima Vergine Maria del SS.mo Rosario, Italy
22 May 192659.5InstalledPrelate of Beatissima Vergine Maria del SS.mo Rosario, Italy
27 Sep 192861.8ResignedPrelate of Beatissima Vergine Maria del SS.mo Rosario, Italy
16 Dec 193569.1Elevated to Cardinal
16 Dec 193569.1ResignedSecret Almoner of the Office of Papal Charities
19 Dec 193569.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
25 Nov 194377.0DiedSecret Almoner Emeritus of the Office of Papal Charities

MicroData Summary for Carlo Cremonesi:
Carlo Cardinal Cremonesi (born , died ) Secret Almoner Emeritus of Papal Charities

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
  • a cardinal for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 2
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014