Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloysius Chen Guo-di (Tchen Chao-t’ien), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Fenyang [Fenyang], China

Titular Bishop of Attuda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1875Born
189620.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
15 Mar 190327.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
10 May 192650.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Fenyang [Fenyang], China
14 Jul 192650.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Attuda
28 Oct 192650.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Attuda
9 Mar 193054.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Fenyang [Fenyang], China

MicroData Summary for Aloysius Chen Guo-di (Tchen Chao-t’ien)
Bishop Aloysius Chen Guo-di (Tchen Chao-t’ien) O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Fenyang [Fenyang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLonchengsien au Chansi
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceFenyang, Vicariate Apostolic of Fenyang [Fenyang]

  • a priest for 26.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,927
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,931
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,926, Number 76
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 27 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast