Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Pius XI

Ambrogio Damiano Achille Ratti

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


from the web site of the diocese

from the web site of the diocese

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1857Born
20 Dec 187922.5Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
6 Jun 191962.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
3 Jul 191962.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Naupactus
28 Oct 191962.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Naupactus
19 Apr 192163.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Adana
13 Jun 192164.0AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
13 Jun 192164.0Elevated to Cardinal
16 Jun 192164.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
6 Feb 192264.6ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
12 Feb 192264.6InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
10 Feb 193981.6DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Ambrogio Damiano Achille Ratti (VIAF: 88598915)
Pope Ambrogio Damiano Achille Ratti (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDesio, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Warsaw, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
Death PlaceVatican, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)St. Peter's Basilica, Grotto, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
  • a cardinal for .6 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 36
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 63
  • loc: AT, 29 Dec 2016
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 209

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast