Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Józef Sebastian Pelczar

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1842Born
17 Jul 186422.5Ordained PriestPriest of Przemyśl, Poland
16 Feb 189957.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
16 Feb 189957.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Miletopolis
19 Mar 189957.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Miletopolis
17 Dec 190058.9AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
28 Mar 192482.1DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
2 Jun 1991Beatified
18 May 2003Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Józef Sebastian Pelczar (VIAF: 45226924)
Bishop St. Józef Sebastian Pelczar (born , died ) Bishop of Przemyśl

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKorczyna, Diocese of Przemyśl
Ordained BishopCathedral, Przemyśl, Diocese of Przemyśl

  • a priest for 59.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 384, and Page 469
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017