Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anatol Wincenty Nowak (Novak)

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1862BornKańczuga
15 Jul 188522.8Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 190038.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland
17 Dec 190038.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Irenopolis in Cilicia
30 Dec 190038.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Irenopolis in Cilicia
30 Sep 192462.0AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
23 Nov 192462.1InstalledBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
5 Apr 193370.5DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland

MicroData Summary for Anatol Wincenty Nowak (Novak):
Bishop Anatol Wincenty Nowak (Novak) (born , died ) Bishop of Przemyśl

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 325
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1924, Page 292

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013