Catholic-Hierarchy DC

August Cardinal Hlond, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace

Archbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1881Born
23 Sep 190524.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
14 Dec 192544.4AppointedBishop of Katowice, Poland
3 Jan 192644.4Ordained BishopBishop of Katowice, Poland
24 Jun 192644.9AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
20 Jun 192745.9Elevated to Cardinal
20 Jun 192745.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace
4 Mar 194664.6AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
4 Mar 194664.6AppointedArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
22 Oct 194867.2DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for August Hlond
August Cardinal Hlond S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrzeckowice

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
  • a cardinal for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1926, Number 1
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 337, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 387, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 523, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 681, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Apr 2021

Quantcast