Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michal Klepacz

Deceased

Bishop of Łódź, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1893Born
2 Jun 191622.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 194653.4AppointedBishop of Łódź, Poland
13 Apr 194753.7Ordained BishopBishop of Łódź, Poland
27 Jan 196773.5DiedBishop of Łódź, Poland

MicroData Summary for Michal Klepacz
Bishop Michal Klepacz (born , died ) Bishop of Łódź

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWarszawa

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018