Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bolesław Hieronim Kłopotowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Mohilev, Belarus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1848Born
26 Jun 187224.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Jul 187224.3Ordained PriestPriest
2 Aug 189749.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec), Ukraine
2 Aug 189749.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Eleutheropolis in Macedonia
21 Nov 189749.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eleutheropolis in Macedonia
14 Dec 189951.7AppointedBishop of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec), Ukraine
15 Apr 190153.0AppointedArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus
23 Jun 190153.2InstalledArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus
24 Feb 190354.9DiedArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus

MicroData Summary for Bolesław Hieronim Kłopotowski (VIAF: 126262657)
Archbishop Bolesław Hieronim Kłopotowski (born , died ) Archbishop of Mohilev

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzarogrodzie, Diocese of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec), Ukraine
Ordained BishopSte Catherine, St. Petersbourg

  • a priest for 30.6 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 257, and Page 351
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 390
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017