Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Baranowski

Deceased

Bishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1835Born
22 Apr 186126.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Mar 186227.2Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 188449.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
24 Mar 188449.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thespiae
24 Jun 188449.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thespiae
2 Aug 189762.5AppointedBishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland
22 Nov 190267.8DiedBishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland

MicroData Summary for Anton Baranowski (VIAF: 73979289)
Bishop Anton Baranowski (born , died ) Bishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOnikszta, Diocese of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
Ordained BishopSte Catherine, St Petersbourg

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 516, and Page 549
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Apr 2017