Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefan Aleksander Zwierowicz

Deceased

Bishop of Sandomierz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1842BornWyrozenby
30 Nov 186927.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
2 Dec 186927.0Ordained PriestPriest
2 Aug 189754.7AppointedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
28 Nov 189755.0Ordained BishopBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
17 Sep 190259.8AppointedBishop of Sandomierz, Poland
4 Jan 190865.1DiedBishop of Sandomierz, Poland

MicroData Summary for Stefan Aleksander Zwierowicz:
Bishop Stefan Aleksander Zwierowicz (born , died ) Bishop of Sandomierz

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • ob/c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • bd/ob/c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 499, and Page 592

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013