Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Wincenty Teofil Chosciak-Popiel

Deceased

Archbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1825Born
5 Aug 184924.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Mar 186337.7AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
6 Dec 186338.4Ordained BishopBishop of Płock, Poland
5 Jul 187550.0AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
15 Mar 188357.7AppointedArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
7 Dec 191287.4DiedArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Wincenty Teofil Chosciak-Popiel
Archbishop Wincenty Teofil Chosciak-Popiel (born , died ) Archbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCzaplach Wielkich, Diocese of Kraków
Ordained BishopAssumption of the Blessed Virgin Mary, Cathedral, Płock, Diocese of Płock
Death PlaceWarszawa, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}
Buried Place (Original)Crypt of the Archbishops, St. John the Baptist, Cathedral, Warszawa, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 49.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 460, and Page 583
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 594
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1863, Number 27
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 43, Number 2,841
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 30 Nov 2020

Quantcast