Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jan Wężyk

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1575¹BornWola Wężykowa
161944.0SelectedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
17 Feb 162045.1ConfirmedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
13 May 162449.3AppointedBishop of Poznań, Poland
1 Jul 162449.5InstalledBishop of Poznań, Poland
162651.0SelectedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
22 Mar 162752.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
27 May 163863.4DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Wężyk:
Archbishop Jan Wężyk (died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 195, and Page 287
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 288
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1620, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 3 Mar 2015