Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrzej Gembicki

Deceased

Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1594¹Born
10 Jan 162834.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
10 Jan 162834.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Teodosia
28 Aug 162834.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Teodosia
19 Apr 163844.3AppointedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
1654¹60.0DiedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Gembicki:
Bishop Andrzej Gembicki , Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)

  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 224, and Page 333

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 14 Jan 2014