Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mikołaj Krosnowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1590¹Born
24 Feb 162535.1Ordained PriestPriest
27 Nov 164151.9AppointedBishop of Wenden (Windau), Poland
1642²52.0Ordained BishopBishop of Wenden (Windau), Poland
12 Jun 164555.4AppointedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
26 Sep 165363.7DiedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mikołaj Krosnowski:
Archbishop Mikołaj Krosnowski (died ) Archbishop of Lviv

  • a priest for 28.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 220, and Page 362
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,352

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013