Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Wawrzyniec Gembicki

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1559Born
10 Nov 160041.2AppointedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
1 Apr 160141.6Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
19 Apr 161050.7AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
14 Mar 161656.6AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
10 Feb 162464.5DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Wawrzyniec Gembicki
Archbishop Wawrzyniec Gembicki (born , died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGembice

  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 195
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 192, Number 15,587
  • ob/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,601, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast