Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claudio Rangoni

Deceased

Bishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1559Born
16 Dec 159233.2AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
10 Jan 159333.2Ordained BishopBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
10 Jan 159838.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
16 Sep 160646.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
2 Sep 162161.9DiedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Claudio Rangoni (VIAF: 162552483)
Bishop Claudio Rangoni (born , died ) Bishop of Reggio Emilia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceModena, Diocese of Modena
Ordained Bishopchapelle du Palais, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,966
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 294
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 284
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 281
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1593, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018