Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Feliciano Ninguarda, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Como, Italy

Note/Previous Titular See: (Nuncio/South Germany)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1524Born
25 Feb 157753.1AppointedBishop of Scala, Italy
Dec 1577³53.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Other
31 Jan 158359.0AppointedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
Sep 1583³59.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Other
30 Jun 158460.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
20 Oct 158460.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
3 Oct 158864.7AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
5 Jan 159571.0DiedBishop of Como, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Feliciano Ninguarda (VIAF: 10638150)
Bishop Feliciano Ninguarda O.P. (born 1524, died ) Bishop of Como

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMorbegno

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 97, and Page 183
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 294
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 276
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1577, Number 8*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast