Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerzy Zamoyski

Deceased

Bishop of Chełm


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1565²BornChełm
19 Feb 160136.1AppointedBishop of Chełm, Poland
27 May 160136.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chełm, Poland
4 Jan 162156.0DiedBishop of Chełm, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerzy Zamoyski:
Bishop Jerzy Zamoyski (died ) Bishop of Chełm

  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations, Volume 3, Page 165
  • b: Les Ordinations, Volume 4, Page 147
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1601, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 20 Jan 2015