Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Łącki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Titular Bishop of Margarita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1562¹Born
15 Sep 159735.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
15 Sep 159735.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Margarita
24 Aug 159836.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Margarita
19 Jan 161755.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Łącki (VIAF: 249735094)
Bishop Franciszek Łącki (born 1562, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Włocławek, Diocese of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)
Death PlaceWłocławek, Diocese of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 231
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 235
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1598, Number 9
  • ln/d/loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ln: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 3 Apr 2019

Quantcast