Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stanisław Karnkowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1520BornKarnkowo
1 Oct 156747.4AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
25 Jan 156847.7Ordained BishopBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
7 Aug 158161.2AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
8 Jun 160383.1DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Karnkowski:
Archbishop Stanisław Karnkowski (born , died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

  • a bishop for 35.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 336, and Page 204
  • c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013