Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filip Padniewski

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1510¹Born
26 Jan 156050.0AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
17 Jul 156050.5AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
12 Apr 157262.2DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filip Padniewski (VIAF: 70102641)
Bishop Filip Padniewski (born 1510, died ) Bishop of Kraków

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSkórki

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 180, and Page 279
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1560, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018