Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Seneca

Deceased

Bishop of Anagni


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Jun 1607AppointedBishop of Anagni, Italy
2 Jul 1607Ordained BishopBishop of Anagni, Italy
11 Aug 1626DiedBishop of Anagni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Seneca
Bishop Antonio Seneca (died ) Bishop of Anagni

  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 82
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1607, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Jul 2016