Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cosimo Dossena, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tortona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1547¹BornPapien
27 Feb 161265.2AppointedBishop of Tortona, Italy
4 Mar 161265.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tortona, Italy
12 Mar 162073.2DiedBishop of Tortona, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cosimo Dossena:
Bishop Cosimo Dossena B. (died ) Bishop of Tortona

  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 173
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 51, Number 287

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013