Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Caesar Fedele

Deceased

Vicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Salona


Events

DateEventTitle
12 May 1607AppointedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
13 Aug 1607AppointedTitular Bishop of Salona
8 Sep 1607Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Salona
27 Dec 1620DiedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Caesar Fedele
Bishop Caesar Fedele (died ) Vicegerent of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 302
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 44, Number 235
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1607, Number 18
  • vice: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast