Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Maria Cardinal Gallo

Deceased

Bishop of Osimo, Italy

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Prefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1553Born
5 Nov 158633.0AppointedBishop of Perugia, Italy
11 Nov 158633.0Ordained BishopBishop of Perugia, Italy
16 Nov 158633.0Elevated to Cardinal
14 Jan 158733.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese in Agone
19 Jul 159137.7AppointedBishop of Osimo, Italy
30 Aug 160046.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
1605²51.2AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
1 Jun 160551.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
28 May 160854.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
17 Aug 161157.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
23 Aug 161561.8AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
16 Sep 161561.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
30 Mar 162066.4DiedBishop of Osimo, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Gallo (VIAF: 314885079)
Antonio Maria Cardinal Gallo (born , died ) Bishop of Osimo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOsimo, Diocese of Osimo
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria in Aracoeli, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 33.3 years
  • a cardinal for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Nov 1586
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 51, and Page 272
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 125
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 25, Number 114
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1586, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018