Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Usimbardi

Deceased

Bishop of Arezzo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1539¹Born
9 Jan 158950.0AppointedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
12 Feb 158950.1Ordained BishopBishop of Arezzo, Italy
28 May 161172.4DiedBishop of Arezzo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Usimbardi (VIAF: 35626903)
Bishop Pietro Usimbardi (born 1539, died ) Bishop of Arezzo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColle di Val d’Elsa, Diocese of Colle di Val d’Elsa
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceArezzo, Diocese of Arezzo

  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 116
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 28, Number 134
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1589, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018