Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Priuli

Deceased

Bishop of Vicenza, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Aug 1579AppointedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
10 Apr 1589AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
3 Aug 1591ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
1603²DiedBishop of Vicenza, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michele Priuli (VIAF: 205148172)
Bishop Michele Priuli (died 1603) Bishop of Vicenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 333
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 281
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1579, Number 27*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018