Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro

Dioecesis Arretina-Cortonensis-Biturgensis seu Burgi Sancti Sepulchri



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Andrea Migliavacca, Bishop
  • Riccardo Fontana, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Arezzo
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Arezzo (erected)
19 June 1325Territory LostDiocese of Arezzo Diocese of Cortona (erected)
13 August 1462Territory LostDiocese of Arezzo Diocese of Pienza e Montalcino (erected)
22 September 1515Territory LostDiocese of Arezzo Diocese of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro) (erected)
10 November 1561Territory LostDiocese of Arezzo Diocese of Montepulciano (erected)
10 May 1947Territory LostDiocese of Arezzo (S. Fiorenzo in Vescona and Muciliano)
Diocese of Chiusi e Pienza (S. Nazario)
Territorial Abbey of Monte Oliveto Maggiore
19 February 1962Territory AddedDiocese of Città di Castello (S. Maria alia Rassinata Parish) Diocese of Arezzo
14 March 1962Territory AddedDiocese of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro) (Parish of S. Maria alia Sovara (in Anghiari)) Diocese of Arezzo
14 March 1962Territory LostDiocese of Arezzo (Parish of S. Maria a Scandolaia (in Monterchi), Church of St. Francis (in Montante/Anghiari)) Diocese of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)
15 October 1964Territory LostDiocese of Arezzo (San Cristoforo a Piazzano in Tuoro sul Trasimeno) Diocese of Cortona
21 November 1978Territory LostDiocese of Arezzo (S. Ansano a Dofana and S. Maria a Montaperti) Archdiocese of Siena
Diocese of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro
30 September 1986UnitedDiocese of Arezzo
Diocese of Cortona
Diocese of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)
Diocese of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro
15 July 2017Territory LostDiocese of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro (San Giovanni Evangelista (in Terontola in Arezzo) and San Martino in Borghetto di Tuoro) Archdiocese of Perugia-Città della Pieve

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Arezzo
1886163,052.0%5930326OTC
1950225,000250,00090.0%355110465483150410336ap1951
1959265,000270,00098.1%329104433612157400324ap1960
1970194,000205,00094.6%283103386502118527327ap1971
1980199,800201,40099.2%257138395505154345333ap1981
Diocese of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro
1990265,329268,35098.9%307964036583141507245ap1991
1999259,980260,000100.0%2571173746959161312247ap2000
2000259,980260,000100.0%2451173627189161312247ap2001
2001259,985261,62699.4%2731173906668135266246ap2002
2002259,999267,09997.3%26810437269812112255244ap2003
2003257,000267,00096.3%27010437468712112252244ap2004
2004285,000300,00095.0%23310433784516108257244ap2005
2006290,000305,00095.1%250753258921879253244ap2007
2012335,000353,70094.7%177462231,5022466410247ap2013
2015347,000365,00095.1%172952671,29925112305245ap2016
2018348,860367,00095.1%167952621,33123120308245ap2019
2020343,845361,76095.0%165892541,35325113291246ap2021

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Arezzo
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 104
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 94
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 116
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 93
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 97, and Page 98
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 98, and Page 99
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 87
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 120
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 66
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 741, to Page 742
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 54, Page 470, and Page 471
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 54, Page 530, and Page 531
  • Diocese of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 79, Page 654, to Page 656

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 24 Aug 2023