Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Ciofi

Deceased

Bishop of Chiusi e Pienza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1787BornCesa
22 Dec 181023.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jan 184355.1AppointedBishop of Chiusi e Pienza, Italy
5 Feb 184355.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chiusi e Pienza, Italy
25 Mar 187082.2DiedBishop of Chiusi e Pienza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Ciofi (VIAF: 88653828)
Bishop Giovanni Battista Ciofi (born , died ) Bishop of Chiusi e Pienza

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 155
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016