Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Giovanni Giuseppe Canali

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ferentino

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1781BornCesano
26 May 180422.9Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 184059.5AppointedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
27 Dec 184059.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ferentino, Italy
24 Jan 184260.6ResignedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
24 Jan 184260.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}
24 Apr 184563.8AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
1 Jan 185169.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Ferentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Giuseppe Canali:
Patriarch Giovanni Giuseppe Canali (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ferentino

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 156, and Page 161
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 193

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013